1 |
Mahant Maharaj Chintamani Parbat, M.A. (Public Administration & Odia) |
18.08.1981 – 03.08.1990 |
2 |
Dr. Ananta Charan Das M.A., Sanskrit, Ph. D. |
04.08.1990 – 03.10.1991 |
3 |
Sri Harekrushna Dash
M.A. Economics |
04.10.1991 – 08.08.1996 |
4 |
Sri Sukadev Pani
M.A. History |
08.08.1996 – 12.08.1997 |
5 |
Dr. Madhabananda Dash
M.Sc. Chemistry, Ph.D. |
12.08.1997 – 29.06.1998 |
6 |
Sri Krushna Chandra Swain
M.A. Philosophy, LLB |
29.06.1998 – 11.10.2001 |
7 |
Sri Jatadhari Mohanty, I/C
M.A. Economics |
11.10.2001 – 31.10.2001 |
8 |
Dr. Krushna Chandra Bastia
M.A., M.Ed., Ph. D. |
31.10.2001 – 29.08.2003 |
9 |
Dr. Lalit Kumar Lenka, I/C
M.A. Odia, Ph. D. |
29.08.2003 – 01.09.2004 |
10 |
Sri Durgha Prasad Pattanaik
M.A. English
|
01.09.2004 – 30.06.2007 |
11 |
Sri Jatadhari Mohanty, I/C
M.A. Economics
|
30.06.2007 – 11.09.2009 |
12 |
Sri Purna Chandra Mohanty
M.A. English
|
11.09.2009 – 05.07.2010 |
13 |
Sri Lakshminarayan Mohanty, I/C
M.A. History
|
05.07.2010 - 13.03.2015 |
14 |
Sri. Kshetrabasi Mishra
|
13.03.2015 - 30.04.2018 |
15 |
Sri. Jatadhari Mohanty
|
30.04.2018 - 31.10.2019 |
16 |
Dr . China Pradhan
|
31.10.2019 Conti... |